|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
24/02/1921 | 15/08/1921 | 173 days | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1924 | 11/10/1924 | 134 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4649 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1926 | 06/12/1926 | 106 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1928 | 03/11/1928 | 73 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1930 | 24/05/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7460 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1932 | 24/09/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1934 | 27/10/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1937 | 13/02/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1938 | 16/07/1938 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1940 | 18/05/1940 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1940 | 10/08/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1941 | 20/12/1941 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21145 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1739 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1947 | 06/12/1947 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 9345 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1948 | 01/1948 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 04/10/1950 | 22/11/1950 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61739 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/07/1952 | 11/09/1952 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 21180 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/12/1952 | 21/01/1953 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/08/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/12/1954 | 15/01/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 21163 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/03/1955 | 04/05/1955 | 49 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1959 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/10/1958 | Colwich MPD - stored locomotives | 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1649 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1435 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
31/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4649 |
||
23/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1926. Dep: 06/12/1926. | ||
23/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928. | ||
12/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7460 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932. | ||
08/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. | ||
29/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937. | ||
25/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938. | ||
29/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
27/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940. | ||
13/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
22/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941. | ||
10/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21145 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
05/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1739 |
||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9345 (Diagram 3) |
||
1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1948. Dep: ?/01/1948. | ||
01/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1950. Dep: 22/11/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61739 |
||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
20/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1952. Dep: 11/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21180 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1952. Dep: 21/01/1953. | ||
25/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
25/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
14/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. | ||
06/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21163 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 04/05/1955. | ||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
02/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
20/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/02/1959. | ||
27/02/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61739 from Colwick (40E) |