|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1920 | 07/1920 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1922 | 04/05/1923 | 156 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1925 | 22/08/1925 | 95 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4648 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1927 | 01/12/1927 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1929 | 09/11/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7268 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1931 | 08/08/1931 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1933 | 05/08/1933 | 81 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1935 | 03/08/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1936 | 23/01/1937 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 8981 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1938 | 01/04/1939 | 105 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 22 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/08/1943 | 01/10/1943 | 48 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/04/1946 | 13/07/1946 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 21169 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1948 | 30/04/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9193 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/05/1948 | 05/05/1948 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/03/1950 | 19/05/1950 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 21144 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/10/1952 | 06/12/1952 | 46 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/05/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/05/1955 | 02/07/1955 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1948 | Eastfield MPD | The following 'K.2's' ex Cowlairs Works have been observed here as follows:-No. 61727 IMM (24/4), still with L.N.E.R. on tender; 61738 SL, also still L.N.E.R. (2/5); 61758 CLK (30/5) and 61743 SL (30/5) | SLS/194807 |
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1648 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1434 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/07/1920. | ||
07/07/1920 | Modification | Diagram 3 number 7548 boiler fitted | ||
30/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1922. Dep: 04/05/1923. | ||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
20/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4648 |
||
24/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1927. Dep: 01/12/1927. | ||
14/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7268 (Diagram 3) |
||
11/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 08/08/1931. | ||
17/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933. | ||
29/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1935. Dep: 03/08/1935. | ||
31/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8981 (Diagram 3) |
||
19/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1938. Dep: 01/04/1939. | ||
22/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. | ||
15/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1943. Dep: 01/10/1943. | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1738 | ||
15/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21169 (Diagram 3) |
||
07/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
26/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
13/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) | ||
24/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1948. Dep: 30/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9193 (Diagram 3) |
||
02/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1948. Dep: 05/05/1948. | ||
08/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61738 | ||
27/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21144 (Diagram 3) |
||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
22/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/10/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. | ||
20/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. | ||
12/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) |
||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
03/07/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61738 from Colwick (40E) |