|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1920 | 04/1920 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1922 | 27/01/1923 | 115 days | General | Green L&NER livery |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1924 | 03/01/1925 | 122 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4645 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1926 | 28/04/1926 | 69 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1927 | 06/08/1927 | 100 days | General | Boiler number 7685 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1929 | 20/04/1929 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1930 | 18/10/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1932 | 12/03/1932 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7683 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1936 | 15/08/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1938 | 26/11/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21188 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1941 | 19/04/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1943 | 11/09/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/11/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 21121 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1948 | 02/04/1948 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61735 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/05/1948 | 16/08/1948 | 80 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/01/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | Side window cab fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/03/1951 | 07/04/1951 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/06/1952 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 29/12/1952 | 27/01/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21164 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1954 | 18/09/1954 | 34 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (yard) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1645 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1431 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/04/1920. | ||
07/04/1920 | Modification | Diagram 3 number 7547 boiler fitted | ||
07/04/1920 | Modification | Diagram 3 number C1789 boiler fitted | ||
05/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923. Work undertaken: Green L&NER livery |
||
04/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1924. Dep: 03/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4645 |
||
19/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/02/1926. Dep: 28/04/1926. | ||
29/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7685 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929. | ||
30/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930. | ||
14/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. | ||
13/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932. | ||
18/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7683 (Diagram 3) |
||
18/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936. | ||
29/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21188 (Diagram 3) |
||
29/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
15/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 19/04/1941. | ||
04/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943. | ||
17/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. | ||
22/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21121 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1735 | ||
21/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
22/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1948. Dep: 02/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61735 |
||
29/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 16/08/1948. | ||
01/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
21/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
29/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. Work undertaken: Side window cab fitted |
||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
20/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951. | ||
24/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1952. | ||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 27/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21164 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/08/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954. | ||
1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
21/01/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61735 from Parkhead (65C) |