|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1921 | 07/01/1922 | 115 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1923 | 27/01/1923 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1924 | 31/12/1924 | 126 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4640 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1925 | 30/05/1925 | 31 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1926 | 05/02/1927 | 115 days | General | Boiler number 7467 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1928 | 09/02/1929 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7265 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1933 | 29/04/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1934 | 07/07/1934 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8562 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1936 | 21/03/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1938 | 02/04/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21111 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21159 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1942 | 09/05/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/04/1944 | 03/06/1944 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/05/1945 | 28/06/1945 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/06/1946 | 24/07/1946 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 21158 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1948 | 17/12/1948 | 59 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61730 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1951 | 01/10/1951 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/11/1951 | 29/03/1952 | 121 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1953 | 17/01/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21146 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/05/1955 | 27/06/1955 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1640 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1425 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
15/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1921. Dep: 07/01/1922. | ||
01/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/01/1923. Dep: 27/01/1923. | ||
05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
28/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1924. Dep: 31/12/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4640 |
||
30/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/04/1925. Dep: 30/05/1925. | ||
14/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1926. Dep: 05/02/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7467 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/08/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
11/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. | ||
30/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7265 (Diagram 3) |
||
18/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933. | ||
19/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8562 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936. | ||
19/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
07/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
05/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21111 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21159 (Diagram 3) |
||
28/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942. | ||
30/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) |
||
29/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1945. Dep: 28/06/1945. | ||
06/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1946. Dep: 24/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21158 (Diagram 3) |
||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1730 | ||
13/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
27/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
01/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
20/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1948. Dep: 17/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61730 |
||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
01/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
15/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
16/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 01/10/1951. | ||
30/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1951. Dep: 29/03/1952. | ||
15/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 17/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21146 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/05/1955. Dep: 27/06/1955. | ||
1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
20/08/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61730 from Immingham (40B) |