Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 690 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17553 Week
» 8609 Month
» 355033 Year
» 3381886 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
62068 |
on |
14/02/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1964 |
Notes
Notes |
Into Doncaster for cutting up 13/2/64 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
31B |
March |
on |
14/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
3w/e |
31/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/01/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1950 |
Queens Park Works |
Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex-Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62068 (14/2), 62069 (20/2) and 62070 (29/3) -the last of the batch. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 62068 (26672/49) and 62070 (26674/49). No. 62070 carries a brass (B.R.) plate which reads '62070 1948.' New Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos, 61360 (22/3), 61361 (24/3), 61362 (31/3) and 61363 (5/4). Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61360-63 (26819-23/50), while Nos. 61360-62 all carry brass numberplates which read '1948.' These locomotives are being built under N.B.L. Order No. L.997. |
SLS/195005 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 62068 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26672 Allocated to March (31B) |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1952. Dep: 27/02/1952. |
|
|
05/03/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1954. Dep: 01/04/1954. |
|
|
21/10/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1954. Dep: 02/11/1954. |
|
|
05/04/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1955. Dep: 21/04/1955. |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1956. Dep: 04/07/1956. |
|
|
22/02/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957. |
|
|
08/04/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1957. Dep: 12/04/1957. |
|
|
23/12/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1957. Dep: 02/01/1958. |
|
|
03/05/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1958. Dep: 14/05/1958. |
|
|
30/09/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1958. Dep: 01/11/1958. |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1960. Dep: 10/11/1960. |
|
|
20/01/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1961. Dep: 07/02/1961. |
|
|
11/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
27/11/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1962. Dep: 18/12/1962. |
|
|
1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62068 from Doncaster (36A) |
|
|