|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1951 | 18/05/1951 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 26 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1954 | 02/04/1954 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1954 | 31/08/1954 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1955 | 11/02/1955 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1956 | 07/03/1956 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1956 | 02/10/1956 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1956 | 17/01/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1958 | 21/02/1958 | 23 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1960 | 05/10/1960 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1960 | 18/11/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1963 | 12/07/1963 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1964 | 08/05/1964 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1965 | 20/12/1965 | 48 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1966 | 05/1966 | Unknown Regime |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2--6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62057 (2/12), 62058 (6/12), 62059 (13/12), 62060 (24/12), 62061 (28/12), 62062 (9/1), 62063 (13/1), 62064 (19/1), 62065 (23/1), 62066 (27/1) and 62067 (1/2). Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62060/61 (26664/65/1949), 62064-67 (26668-71/1949). | SLS/195003 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/02/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62067 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26671 Allocated to March (31B) |
||
20/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1951. Dep: 18/05/1951. | ||
27/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953. | ||
22/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954. | ||
19/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1954. Dep: 31/08/1954. | ||
14/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1955. Dep: 11/02/1955. | ||
15/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1956. Dep: 07/03/1956. | ||
20/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 02/10/1956. | ||
27/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1956. Dep: 17/01/1957. | ||
30/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1958. Dep: 21/02/1958. | ||
24/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1960. Dep: 05/10/1960. | ||
24/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1960. Dep: 18/11/1960. | ||
27/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
28/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1963. Dep: 12/07/1963. | ||
08/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1964. Dep: 08/05/1964. | ||
10/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
10/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
03/11/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1965. Dep: 20/12/1965. | ||
1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1966. Dep: ?/05/1966. | ||
1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
18/01/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62067 from Blyth (North) (52F) |