|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/03/1951 | 10/03/1951 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 26 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1953 | 15/10/1953 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1953 | 27/11/1953 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1954 | 14/09/1954 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1957 | 31/10/1957 | 27 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1959 | 20/08/1959 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1960 | 08/04/1960 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1960 | 28/10/1960 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1964 | 13/06/1964 | 69 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1964 | 16/06/1964 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2--6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62057 (2/12), 62058 (6/12), 62059 (13/12), 62060 (24/12), 62061 (28/12), 62062 (9/1), 62063 (13/1), 62064 (19/1), 62065 (23/1), 62066 (27/1) and 62067 (1/2). Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62060/61 (26664/65/1949), 62064-67 (26668-71/1949). | SLS/195003 |
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62057 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26661 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) |
||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
07/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951. | ||
25/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. | ||
01/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1953. Dep: 15/10/1953. | ||
19/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 27/11/1953. | ||
12/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1954. Dep: 14/09/1954. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
05/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1957. Dep: 31/10/1957. | ||
04/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1959. Dep: 20/08/1959. | ||
28/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1960. Dep: 08/04/1960. | ||
04/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1960. Dep: 28/10/1960. | ||
06/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1964. Dep: 13/06/1964. | ||
15/06/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1964. Dep: 16/06/1964. | ||
13/03/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale | ||
01/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62057 from Blyth (North) (52F) |