|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/10/1950 | 04/10/1950 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1951 | 03/08/1951 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1951 | 29/11/1951 | 23 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1954 | 20/05/1954 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1954 | 21/10/1954 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1960 | 01/10/1960 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1960 | 05/11/1960 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1961 | 16/05/1961 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62040 (3/10), 62041 (6/10), 62042 (7/10), 62043 (11/10), 62044 (13/10), 62045 (14/10), 62046/48 (21/10), 62047 (20/10), 62049 (25/10), 62050 (27/10), 62051 (2/11), and 62052 (4/11), while No. 62055 was 'road-steamed' at the Works on 1/11. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62040-42 (26644-46/49), 62045-52 (26649-56/49). No. 62051 is the first of the Order to have the crest on the tender and as yet none have appeared with the Power Classification on the cab. | SLS/194912 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/10/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62049 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26653 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) |
||
02/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1950. Dep: 04/10/1950. | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
01/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
22/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
17/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
28/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1951. Dep: 03/08/1951. | ||
07/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1951. Dep: 29/11/1951. | ||
22/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1954. Dep: 20/05/1954. | ||
17/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/10/1954. Dep: 21/10/1954. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. | ||
17/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. | ||
23/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1960. Dep: 01/10/1960. | ||
25/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960. | ||
17/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/04/1961. Dep: 16/05/1961. | ||
1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62049 from York (North) (50A) |