Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2157 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 19020 Week
» 10076 Month
» 356500 Year
» 3383353 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
62045 |
on |
14/10/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1967 |
Notes
Notes |
Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth 9/67 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
on |
14/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
23/04/1966 |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
4w/e |
15/07/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/09/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Queens Park Works |
Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62040 (3/10), 62041 (6/10), 62042 (7/10), 62043 (11/10), 62044 (13/10), 62045 (14/10), 62046/48 (21/10), 62047 (20/10), 62049 (25/10), 62050 (27/10), 62051 (2/11), and 62052 (4/11), while No. 62055 was 'road-steamed' at the Works on 1/11. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62040-42 (26644-46/49), 62045-52 (26649-56/49). No. 62051 is the first of the Order to have the crest on the tender and as yet none have appeared with the Power Classification on the cab. |
SLS/194912 |
02/07/1967 |
Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (West Hartlepool) |
Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). |
SLS/196708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/10/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 62045 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26649 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
23/05/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1950. Dep: 26/05/1950. |
|
|
19/12/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1951. Dep: 27/12/1951. |
|
|
11/03/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 02/04/1952. |
|
|
12/01/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1954. Dep: 20/01/1954. |
|
|
08/07/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 05/08/1954. |
|
|
18/10/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1956. Dep: 28/12/1956. |
|
|
03/08/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1957. Dep: 30/08/1957. |
|
|
07/10/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1957. Dep: 11/10/1957. |
|
|
21/07/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1959. Dep: 01/08/1959. |
|
|
01/10/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959. |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1960. Dep: 04/11/1960. |
|
|
21/03/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1961. Dep: 13/04/1961. |
|
|
09/09/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1963. Dep: 02/11/1963. |
|
|
1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1966. |
|
|
27/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62045 from Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|