|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1950 | 19/01/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1951 | 30/05/1951 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1953 | 09/03/1953 | 26 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1953 | 22/12/1953 | 20 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1954 | 14/09/1954 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1955 | 04/03/1955 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1956 | 03/01/1956 | -268 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1957 | 02/02/1957 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1958 | 13/05/1958 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1959 | 21/02/1959 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1961 | 16/03/1961 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1961 | 28/12/1961 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1962 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62035 (7/9), 62036 (9/9), 62037 (14/9), 62038 (16/9) and 62039 (22/9). There were not any deliveries at all during W/E 1/10. - Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62035 (26639/49), 62038/39 (26642/43/49). Nos. 62051-70 are to appear with the crest, while so far all have appeared with British Railways in full on the tender. | SLS/194911 |
25/09/1949 | Eastfield MPD | On 25/9 Nos. 62034/35/38/39 were at Eastfield, No. 62036 at Fort William, whilst No. 62037 was at March. | SLS/194911 |
20/03/1951 | Cambridge Turns | The Cambridge turns into Kings X continue to provide variety; in addition to the occasional 'Claud,' 61005 (30F) appeared on 20/3/51. Also in March both the Kl's on loan to Cambridge appeared, one of them, 62039, returned on the 12.5 Down 'buffet' and neither the driver nor fireman was in the least impressed with their charge on that schedule, and time was lost on the run. Of the new series of Bl's, 61370-5, all have been noted in London so far on various Lincoln and Immingham turns. | SLS/195105 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/09/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62039 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26643 Allocated to March (MAR) |
||
12/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1950. Dep: 19/01/1950. | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
01/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
07/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
02/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1951. Dep: 30/05/1951. | ||
12/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1953. Dep: 09/03/1953. | ||
03/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/12/1953. Dep: 22/12/1953. | ||
27/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1954. Dep: 14/09/1954. | ||
03/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1955. Dep: 04/03/1955. | ||
28/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/09/1956. Dep: 03/01/1956. | ||
25/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1957. Dep: 02/02/1957. | ||
05/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 13/05/1958. | ||
21/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1959. Dep: 21/02/1959. | ||
13/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1961. Dep: 16/03/1961. | ||
04/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1961. Dep: 28/12/1961. | ||
29/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
10/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/05/1962. | ||
14/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62039 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |