Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2621 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 19484 Week
» 10540 Month
» 356964 Year
» 3383817 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
62035 |
on |
07/09/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1965 |
Notes
Notes |
Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 10/65. Cut up 8/11/65 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
MAR |
March |
on |
07/09/1949 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
5w/e |
31/12/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1949 |
Queens Park Works |
Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62035 (7/9), 62036 (9/9), 62037 (14/9), 62038 (16/9) and 62039 (22/9). There were not any deliveries at all during W/E 1/10. - Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62035 (26639/49), 62038/39 (26642/43/49). Nos. 62051-70 are to appear with the crest, while so far all have appeared with British Railways in full on the tender. |
SLS/194911 |
25/09/1949 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 25/9 Nos. 62034/35/38/39 were at Eastfield, No. 62036 at Fort William, whilst No. 62037 was at March. |
SLS/194911 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 62035 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26639 Allocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
12/01/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1950. Dep: 19/01/1950. |
|
|
02/10/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1951. Dep: 09/11/1951. |
|
|
05/11/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1953. Dep: 02/12/1953. |
|
|
27/04/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1954. Dep: 03/05/1954. |
|
|
12/07/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1954. Dep: 28/07/1954. |
|
|
13/01/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1955. Dep: 04/02/1955. |
|
|
18/05/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/05/1955. Dep: 09/06/1955. |
|
|
08/05/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 07/06/1956. |
|
|
11/07/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1956. Dep: 19/07/1956. |
|
|
10/04/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1958. Dep: 09/05/1958. |
|
|
27/05/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1960. Dep: 02/07/1960. |
|
|
18/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
09/01/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1963. Dep: 25/02/1963. |
|
|
1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
18/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62035 from Frodingham (36C) |
|
|