|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 05/01/1950 | 12/01/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1951 | 04/09/1951 | 27 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1951 | 21/09/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1952 | 22/10/1952 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1953 | 22/09/1953 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1954 | 28/01/1954 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1954 | 05/08/1954 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1955 | 29/09/1955 | 35 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1956 | 05/01/1957 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1959 | 03/10/1959 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1962 | 09/08/1962 | 52 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Queens Park Works | New Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex O.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 62001 (30/5), 62002 (1/6) and 62003 (3/6), while No. 62013 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 2/6. These locomotives are being built under N.B.L. Order No. L.982. It is understood that a further batch of Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's-Nos. 61360-99-are to be constructed here. | SLS/194907 |
27/01/1963 | Berkeley Road (Northallerton) | Berkeley Road south curve (ex-GWR) was permanently closed w.e.f. 27th January, 1963, after being disused since the Severn Bridge disaster. | SLS/196304 |
04/03/1963 | Northallerton & Blaydon MPD (Northallerton) | Northallerton shed (51J) closed on 4th March and its duties and engines (62003/44, 78011/2/4/5) were transferred to Darlington. From 4th March too, Blaydon lost its steam allocation and is now a sub-shed of Gateshead (52A), all its work being taken over by Type 3 diesels which are all treble-shifted. It is expected that Scarborough (50E), Malton (50F) and Heaton (52B) are to be closed with the Summer tt. upon the arrival of further diesels. | SLS/196304 |
06/05/1963 | Scottish Region (Northallerton) | Steam made a rare appearance on the GNS on Monday, 6th May, when a B1 and a standard 4 took from Aberdeen a special train to Lossiemouth from Crewe. Recently this train has run via Dava and the Highland main line. On 19th April the 1-15 p.m. special from Aberdeen to Glasgow was hauled from Perth by Clan Mackenzie. On the 20th April, the 10-03 a.m. ex Waverley to Perth was double-headed by 61076 an 45433. | SLS/196304 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/06/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62003 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26607 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) |
||
25/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
05/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1950. Dep: 12/01/1950. | ||
09/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1951. Dep: 04/09/1951. | ||
18/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1951. Dep: 21/09/1951. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
09/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 22/10/1952. | ||
17/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1953. Dep: 22/09/1953. | ||
15/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1954. Dep: 28/01/1954. | ||
01/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1954. Dep: 05/08/1954. | ||
26/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955. | ||
26/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1956. Dep: 05/01/1957. | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
25/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
28/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1959. Dep: 03/10/1959. | ||
03/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
19/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1962. Dep: 09/08/1962. | ||
03/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
07/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62003 from Darlington (51A) |