Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4088 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17494 Week
» 70510 Month
» 190037 Year
» 3216890 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
75329 |
m/e |
08/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8044 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68044 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
5319 |
To Service |
During 08/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/10/1962 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 75329 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5319 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8044 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68044 |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
29/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68044 |
|
|