|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1945 | To Service | To service as WD Number 75327 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5317 |
||
07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8042 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) | ||
09/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68042 | ||
10/1949 | Modification | Modification: Extended bunker fitted | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
10/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68042 |