Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3931 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17337 Week
» 70353 Month
» 189880 Year
» 3216733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
818 |
m/e |
04/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9818 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8465 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68465 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J83 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4726 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/08/1957 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1901 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 818 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4726 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9818 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8465 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68465 |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
12/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68465 |
|
|