17/06/1961 |
Inverurie Works |
Inverurie Works scrap yard contained the following on 17th June-40574/94, 40611/22/88, 43868, 54482/8, 54505, 55198, 56246, 56376, 57232, 57324, 57552/4, 57609, 61784, 62495, 62671, 65285/95, 68459, 69136/43 and awaiting scrapping were 56240 an 65261. A number of these have not yet been withdrawn prior to 8th May! On 24th June extra arrivals were 62474/9 an 55185 whilst 54483 was on Ferryhill en route Inverurie. |
SLS/196107 |
04/07/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. |
SLS/196108 |
18/11/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
Awaiting shopping or being shopped: 44283, 44319/24, 57251, 64564, 64812, 73106. Awaiting scrapping: 55200/2. Scrapped: 40574/9/94, 40603/48, 43883, 55236, 57349/56/73, 57554, 64534/65, 65227, 68459/71 remains. Ex-Works: 57611. |
SLS/196112 |
10/03/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Boilers and fireboxes in 'cemetery') |
Awaiting shopping-44328, 64553, 64572 an 90455; shopped during last four weeks-44189, 64630, 65323/7; cut-up during last five weeks-55222/6/7/33, 56305, 57233/46/57, 57429, an 40619. Boilers and fireboxes in 'cemetery'-40574/94/603/18/9/50/63, 44319, 54491/3, 55198, 55207/8/15/6/22/6/7/30, 56305, 57257/349/429/552/4/85, 65246 an 68459. |
SLS/196204 |