Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1092 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18895 Week
» 71911 Month
» 191438 Year
» 3218291 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2334 |
m/e |
08/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8741 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68741 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Works Number |
412 |
To Service |
During 08/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/06/1959 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1922 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2334 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 412 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8741 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68741 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
24/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
22/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68741 |
|
|