Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 569 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13975 Week
» 66991 Month
» 186518 Year
» 3213371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2308 |
m/e |
11/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8715 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68715 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 11/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 26/07/1961 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2308 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8715 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68715 |
|
|
10/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
26/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68715 |
|
|