Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2658 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16064 Week
» 69080 Month
» 188607 Year
» 3215460 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2178 |
m/e |
09/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8695 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68695 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 09/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/04/1962 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
on |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1914 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2178 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8695 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68695 |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68695 |
|
|