Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2766 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16172 Week
» 69188 Month
» 188715 Year
» 3215568 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1747 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8687 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68687 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 15/09/1961 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
ALLOC |
54B |
Tyne Dock |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/08/1961 |
York South |
York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1747 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8687 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68687 |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
15/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68687 |
|
|