Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1796 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15202 Week
» 68218 Month
» 187745 Year
» 3214598 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1741 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8685 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68685 |
on |
28/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/10/1960 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
51F |
West Auckland |
4w/e |
26/05/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1741 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8685 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
28/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68685 |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
03/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68685 |
|
|