Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2788 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16194 Week
» 69210 Month
» 188737 Year
» 3215590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1728 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8681 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68681 |
m/e |
09/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/11/1960 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1899 |
NEV |
|
Neville Hill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
50A |
|
York (North) |
5w/e |
17/12/1955 |
55E |
|
|
4w/e |
17/11/1956 |
55E |
|
|
5w/e |
19/01/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/11/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
NMN |
|
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
LOAN |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1951 |
Locomotives still not renumbered |
Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1728 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8681 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
09/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68681 |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
22/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68681 |
|
|