Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4905 Week
» 34403 Month
» 371249 Year
» 1592814 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1864 m/e 11/1895
London and North Eastern Railway 8316 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 68316 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7111/1895
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1895
Withdrawal Fri 14/10/1960
Service Life 64 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1895
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948
54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 14/02/1953
51C West Hartlepool w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn on 14/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   on 14/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1895 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1864
Built at Darlington Works
   
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8316    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68316    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
14/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68316    

prev