Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 475 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19386 Week
» 84340 Month
» 287004 Year
» 3313857 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1690 |
m/e |
10/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8314 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68314 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 10/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/04/1960 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1895 |
GHD |
|
Gateshead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52D |
|
Tweedmouth |
w/e |
23/01/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/04/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
4w/e |
23/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1895 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1690 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8314 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68314 |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
14/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68314 |
|
|