Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 307 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1556 Week
» 21998 Month
» 358844 Year
» 1580409 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1689 m/e 10/1895
London and North Eastern Railway 8313 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 68313 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7110/1895
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 10/1895
Withdrawal w/e Mon 03/09/1956
Service Life 60 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1895
SEL Selby on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 03/09/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 19/06/1948
WDN   w/e 03/09/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1895 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1689
Built at Darlington Works
   
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8313    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68313    
03/09/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 68313    

prev prev