Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1209 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7599 Week
» 37097 Month
» 373943 Year
» 1595508 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1688 m/e 10/1895
London and North Eastern Railway 8312 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68312 m/e 06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7110/1895
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 10/1895
Withdrawal Mon 02/02/1959
Service Life 63 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1895
MID Middlesbrough on 01/01/1948
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 02/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
WDN   on 02/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1895 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1688
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8312    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID)    
06/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68312    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
02/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68312    

prev prev