Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1119 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 34429 Month
» 371275 Year
» 1592840 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1836 m/e 12/1894
London and North Eastern Railway 8309 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68309 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7112/1894
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1894
Withdrawal Thu 14/04/1960
Service Life 65 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1894
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
50A York (North) w/e 18/04/1959
   Withdrawn on 14/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead on 30/06/1947
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 18/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1894 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1836
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8309    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68309    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
14/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68309    

prev prev