Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1836 |
m/e |
12/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8309 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68309 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 12/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/04/1960 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1894 |
GHD |
|
Gateshead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
50A |
|
York (North) |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/04/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GHD |
Gateshead |
on |
30/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1894 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1836 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8309 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68309 |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
14/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68309 |
|
|