Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 327 Today
» 1365 Yesterday
» 4187 Week
» 24629 Month
» 361475 Year
» 1583040 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1832 m/e 12/1894
London and North Eastern Railway 8306 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68306 on 06/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7112/1894
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1894
Withdrawal Sat 19/07/1958
Service Life 63 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1894
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 19/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 14/07/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1894 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1832
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8306    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
06/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68306    
19/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 68306    

prev prev