Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15078 Week
» 68094 Month
» 187621 Year
» 3214474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1832 |
m/e |
12/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8306 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68306 |
on |
06/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 12/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/07/1958 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1894 |
WHL |
|
West Hartlepool |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/07/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/07/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1894 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1832 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8306 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
06/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68306 |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68306 |
|
|