Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 795 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7184 Week
» 27626 Month
» 364472 Year
» 1586037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1831 m/e 12/1894
London and North Eastern Railway 8305 m/e 03/1946
British Railways 68305 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7112/1894
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1894
Withdrawal Mon 24/11/1958
Service Life 63 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1894
SKN Stockton on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 24/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe m/e 03/12/1945
WDN   on 24/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1894 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1831
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8305    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68305    
24/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 68305    

prev prev