Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1247 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7637 Week
» 37135 Month
» 373981 Year
» 1595546 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1797 m/e 12/1894
London and North Eastern Railway 8304 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 68304 m/e 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7112/1894
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1894
Withdrawal w/e Tue 09/11/1954
Service Life 59 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1894
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 09/11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 09/11/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108
31/10/1954 Darlington Works Darlington Works have completed Class '2' B.R. engines up to No. 78039 and withdrawal of old N.E.R. types has speeded up recently. Nos. 69770, 69385, 68258, 68292 (this engine had the extra hanging buffers for shunting the old cauldron wagons long since gone), 68304, 65661/7/86/705/10, and 62358/71/4/80/89. 62371 is of note as she is one of the 1942 rebuilt class''D20' engines, and also, in her early N.E. days as No. 592 she was stationed at Edinburgh, for working the East Coast trains to Newcastle, with Driver John Graham, who was later promoted to Night Running Foreman at Bank Top, Darlington. One thing peculiar to this engine was the absence of brass beading on the splasher above the rear driving wheels, which gave her an odd look. SLS/195412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1894 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1797
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8304    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68304    
09/11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 68304    

prev prev