Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1214 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7604 Week
» 37102 Month
» 373948 Year
» 1595513 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 980 m/e 01/1893
London and North Eastern Railway 8301 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 68301 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7101/1893
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 01/1893
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1956
Service Life 63 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1893
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 26/11/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DAR Darlington on 04/05/1947
WDN   on 26/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/01/1943 New \"Antelope\" Class The new 'Antelope' Class 4-6-0 8301 Springbok was on view at Liverpool Street on 7th January, and we hope to give full details when available. The boiler is as fitted to the 'B.17' ' class, but works at a higher pressure. The 6' 2' coupled wheels are as used for the 'Green Arrow' mixed traffic engines, and the 20' cyls. with 26' stroke are from the 'K.2' pattern but with steam passages and distribution modified in accordance with recent experience. Except for wheel centres, buffer sockets and the horns, all parts normally supplied in cast steel have been fabricated in the L.N.E.R. workshops. The tender is standard, holding 4200 gallons of water and 71 tons of coal. Weight of engine and tender, in working order, 123 tons 3 cwt. The tractive effort is 268781b., and Springbok, No. 8301, ranks as one of the most powerful mixed traffic locomotives in use on the L.N.E.R. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 980
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8301    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68301    
26/11/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 68301    

prev prev