Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1118 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4930 Week
» 34428 Month
» 371274 Year
» 1592839 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 972 m/e 01/1893
London and North Eastern Railway 8297 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 68297 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7101/1893
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 01/1893
Withdrawal Sat 26/05/1956
Service Life 63 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1893
YK York (North) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 26/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 21/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 Easingwold Railway This line now uses a York 'J.71' for a month at a time, No. 8246 was used during August and No. 8297 in September; their own 0-6-OST being still derelict at North Road Works. SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 972
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8297    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68297    
26/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 68297    

prev prev