Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 797 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7186 Week
» 27628 Month
» 364474 Year
» 1586039 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1199 m/e 11/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8296 on 24/03/1946
British Railways 68296 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7111/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1892
Withdrawal Sat 19/07/1958
Service Life 65 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1892
HLB Hull Botanic Gardens on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 19/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
WDN   on 30/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1954 York MPD During this period the South shed was temporarily reopened while repairs were being effected to the turntable in No. 4 roundhouse at the North shed. New Standard Class 3 2-6-0's from Swindon 77002 and 77003 called at York on 17/3/54 and 19/3/54 respectively en route for Darlington. The following Ll 2-6-4T's called at York en route from the south to Darlington Works for repair: 67792 (34E)-19/3/54, 67718 (34E)-29/3/54, 67756-9/4/54. On this latter date 67753 (34B) passed through York resplendent ex-Darlington Works, and likewise 67764 (53B) and 67795 (34E) on 20/4/54. J71 68296 (53A) and 68242 (53A) passed through York ex-Darlington Works on 19/3/54 and 12/4/54 respectively en route for Hull. On 9/4/54 J71 68238 (20D) was at York with rods 'down' while proceeding from Normanton to Darlington Works, and similarly 69104 (53A) from Hull to Darlington on 20/4/54. Another unusual visitor was 60509 (64B) en route from the Scottish Region to Doncaster Works on 28/4/54. 90439 (35A) was under repair at York shed on 29/3/54. SLS/195406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1199
Built at Darlington Works
   
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8296    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68296    
19/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 68296    

prev prev