Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1209 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7599 Week
» 37097 Month
» 373943 Year
» 1595508 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1198 m/e 11/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8295 on 24/03/1946
British Railways 68295 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7111/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1892
Withdrawal Mon 23/02/1959
Service Life 66 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1892
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948
51F West Auckland 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn on 23/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WHL West Hartlepool w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 23/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1198
Built at Darlington Works
   
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8295    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68295    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
23/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68295    

prev prev