Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 861 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7250 Week
» 27692 Month
» 364538 Year
» 1586103 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1197 m/e 11/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8294 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68294 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7111/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/11/1956
Service Life 64 yrs , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1892
YK York (North) on 01/01/1948
20D Normanton 4w/e 29/12/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 10/11/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 20D Normanton w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 20D Normanton 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 20D Normanton 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   w/e 10/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1197
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8294    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68294    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (20D)    
10/11/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 68294    

prev prev