Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1012 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4824 Week
» 34322 Month
» 371168 Year
» 1592733 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1155 m/e 08/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8292 on 03/02/1946
British Railways 68292 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7108/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 08/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/10/1954
Service Life 62 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1892
YK York (North) on 01/01/1948
20D Normanton 4w/e 29/12/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 16/10/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 20D Normanton w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 20D Normanton 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 20D Normanton 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   w/e 16/10/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1155
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8292    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68292    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (20D)    
16/10/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 68292    

prev prev