Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 370 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1619 Week
» 22061 Month
» 358907 Year
» 1580472 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1151 m/e 08/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8291 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 68291 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7108/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 08/1892
Withdrawal Sat 26/05/1956
Service Life 63 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1892
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 26/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 23/04/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1151
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8291    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68291    
26/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 68291    

prev prev