Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1060 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4872 Week
» 34370 Month
» 371216 Year
» 1592781 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1143 m/e 07/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8290 on 03/03/1946
British Railways 68290 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7107/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 07/1892
Withdrawal Mon 12/01/1959
Service Life 66 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1892
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948
51D Middlesbrough 5w/e 22/10/1955
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 12/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
WDN   on 12/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806
23/02/1955 Snowplough fitted Q6\'s On 23rd February, 0-8-0 Q6 63346 and another unidentified Q6 were observed coupled together with large pusher type snow ploughs attached at each end of the locomotives. The locomotives were on snow plough duty on the Consett-Shotley Bridge-Newcastle line, proceeding in the direction of Newcastle near Ebchester. Later on the same afternoon, the two engines were seen near Annfield Plain on the Consett-Tyne Dock line. On 19th February, 0-6-0T J71 68290 was observed near East Boldon travelling light in the direction of Newcastle. SLS/195504

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1143
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8290    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68290    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
12/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68290    

prev prev