Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1084 |
m/e |
07/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8288 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
British Railways |
68288 |
on |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 07/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/11/1950 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1892 |
HLD |
|
Hull Dairycoates |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1084 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
10/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8288 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 68288 but not taken up |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8288 |
|
|