Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 378 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1627 Week
» 22069 Month
» 358915 Year
» 1580480 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1140 m/e 03/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8282 on 24/02/1946
British Railways 68282 on 09/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7103/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 03/1892
Withdrawal w/e Mon 26/10/1953
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1892
YK York (North) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 26/10/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 26/10/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1140
Built at Darlington Works
   
24/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8282    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK)    
09/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68282    
26/10/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 68282    

prev prev