Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1024 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18827 Week
» 71843 Month
» 191370 Year
» 3218223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1103 |
m/e |
02/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8281 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
68281 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 02/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/11/1953 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/12/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed 2MT 78010 an 78011 is ready for trials. Diesel shunters are out up to 13074, with the next four nearly completed. J2 65023 (fully lined out) and J5 65488, both from 38A, arrived here on 3rd December for cutting up. J77 68281 has also been cut up. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1103 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8281 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68281 |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
23/11/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68281 |
|
|