Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1223 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7613 Week
» 37111 Month
» 373957 Year
» 1595522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 572 m/e 02/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8278 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 68278 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7102/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 02/1892
Withdrawal Mon 06/02/1961
Service Life 69 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1892
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948
52c Alston 4w/e 15/11/1952
52B Heaton 4w/e 25/09/1954
54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn on 06/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 52C.3 Hexham 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   on 06/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 572
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 8278    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68278    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Alston (52c)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
06/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68278    

prev prev