Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1224 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7614 Week
» 37112 Month
» 373958 Year
» 1595523 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 449 m/e 01/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8275 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 68275 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7101/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 01/1892
Withdrawal Wed 08/02/1961
Service Life 69 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1892
YK York (North) on 01/01/1948
50C Selby 4w/e 18/02/1956
55E Normanton w/e 19/09/1959
   Withdrawn on 08/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 03/10/1959
WDN   on 08/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 449
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8275    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68275    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
08/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68275    

prev prev