Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4905 Week
» 34403 Month
» 371249 Year
» 1592814 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 280 m/e 11/1891
London and North Eastern Railway 8273 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 68273 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7111/1891
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal Thu 14/11/1957
Service Life 66 yrs , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1891
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948
52C Blaydon 5w/e 23/06/1951
50A York (North) 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn on 14/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon w/e 23/06/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 13/07/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 280
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8273    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68273    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
14/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 68273    

prev prev