Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 360 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1609 Week
» 22051 Month
» 358897 Year
» 1580462 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 252 m/e 11/1891
London and North Eastern Railway 8272 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 68272 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7111/1891
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal Mon 06/02/1961
Service Life 69 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1891
TDK Tyne Dock on 01/01/1948
52B Heaton 5w/e 17/01/1953
52A Gateshead 4w/e 19/12/1953
51L Thornaby w/e 31/01/1959
   Withdrawn on 06/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 06/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 252
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8272    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tyne Dock (TDK)    
12/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68272    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
06/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68272    

prev prev