Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1275 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7665 Week
» 37163 Month
» 374009 Year
» 1595574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 248 m/e 09/1890
London and North Eastern Railway 8267 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 68267 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7109/1890
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 09/1890
Withdrawal Thu 14/11/1957
Service Life 67 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1890
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
52C Blaydon 5w/e 23/06/1951
52A Gateshead 3w/e 12/11/1955
   Withdrawn on 14/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 52C Blaydon w/e 23/06/1951
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 03/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1890 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 248
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8267    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68267    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
14/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 68267    

prev prev