Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 953 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2292 Week
» 31790 Month
» 368636 Year
» 1590201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 179 m/e 09/1890
London and North Eastern Railway 8265 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 68265 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7109/1890
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 09/1890
Withdrawal Mon 31/08/1959
Service Life 69 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1890
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
52B Heaton 5w/e 23/06/1951
54B Tyne Dock 5w/e 17/01/1953
   Withdrawn on 31/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 20/11/1948
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 24/01/1953
WDN   on 31/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1890 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 179
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8265    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68265    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
31/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68265    

prev prev