Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1140 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4952 Week
» 34450 Month
» 371296 Year
» 1592861 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 177 m/e 09/1890
London and North Eastern Railway 8264 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 68264 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7109/1890
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 09/1890
Withdrawal w/e Mon 25/01/1960
Service Life 69 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1890
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 18/05/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 25/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   w/e 25/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1890 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 177
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8264    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68264    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
25/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68264    

prev prev